Alarie, Andrea Felicia (CPSO#: 95482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: Mousseau, Andrea Felicia (used until: 21 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
475 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4V5
Phone: (519) 744-8561
Fax: (519) 744-3089
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 20 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA FELICIA ALARIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALARIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2013 to 03 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 04 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 04 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 21 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017