Alattas, Khadijah Yasin Abdallah (CPSO#: 101232)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jun 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2013 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014