Alawadhi, Mahmoud A M A (CPSO#: 75505)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 18 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 19 Jul 2001 to 18 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 19 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003