Alawadhi, Mohamed Amin (CPSO#: 59045)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 01 Jan 1990
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 1990