Alawi, Khalid Abdullah Shayef (CPSO#: 76737)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007