Alawi, Maha Mahmoud Saad (CPSO#: 80600)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 05 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 31 May 2004
PEAP - Resident - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010