Alawwad, Abdullah Saleh Mohammed (CPSO#: 78652)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 27 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 28 Oct 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006