Albanna, Mohammad (CPSO#: 78293)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Leeds, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 21 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 03 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2009