Albanyan, Saleh Abdulrahman S (CPSO#: 104232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 27 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Medical Genetics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALEH ABDULRAHMAN S ALBANYAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALBANYAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALBANYAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALBANYAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALBANYAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALBANYAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALBANYAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Aug 2014
PEAP - Resident - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 26 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018