Albar, Nezar Yassin Ali (CPSO#: 85586)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2008 to 07 Nov 2008
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 2008