Albashir, Siwar Mazen (CPSO#: 98972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main Street West
Hsc 3V3
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76380
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amad & Albashir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Amad ( CPSO# 77874 )
Dr. S. Albashir ( CPSO# 98972 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 8-406
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5386

Business Address:
HSC 3V3
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIWAR MAZEN ALBASHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBASHIR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2017