Albedwawi, Saif Saeed Mohd Salem Bin Salmin (CPSO#: 81318)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007