Albelda, Louis (CPSO#: 20410)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Valencia, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004