Alberga, Vincent Hamilton (CPSO#: 17123)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Mar 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000