Albers, Jan Martinus (CPSO#: 63684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Doctor Bernstein
Health and Diet Clinics
77 Adelaide Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1E1
Phone: (416) 869-3118
Fax: (416) 362-2728
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.M. Albers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Albers ( CPSO# 63684 )

Business Address:
Doctor Bernstein
Health and Diet Clinics
77 Adelaide Street West
P O Box 342
Toronto ON  M5X 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 869-3118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAN MARTINUS ALBERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992