Albert, Darren Lee (CPSO#: 60852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 440
8000 Decarie
Montreal QC  H4P 2S4
Phone: (514) 340-3937
Fax: (514) 340-2729

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 25 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN LEE ALBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990