Albert, Michel William (CPSO#: 83762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Selkirk St.
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N1
Phone: (613) 763-6882
Fax: (613) 317-1889
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Montreal Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4212
Fax: (613) 748-4971
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Albert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Albert ( CPSO# 83762 )

Business Address:
11 Selkirk Street
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N1
Phone Number: (613) 763-6882

Business Address:
713 Montreal Raod
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Sep 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL WILLIAM ALBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 27 Sep 2005 to 24 Oct 2005
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006