Albert, Michelle Suzanne (CPSO#: 59769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
1450 King Street
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 721-4946
Fax: (905) 721-6170
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Burke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Albert ( CPSO# 59769 )
Dr. H. Burke ( CPSO# 59437 )

Business Address:
1450 King Street
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 721-4946

Business Address:
Suite 2100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-0323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE SUZANNE ALBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1989