Alberti, Peter William Richard Mayer (CPSO#: 31867)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1980
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 1996
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 31 Dec 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Oct 1996
Summary:

 In October 1996, Dr. Alberti pleaded guilty to the charge of professional misconduct, in that he 
 engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional contrary to paragraph 
 27.32 of Regulation 448/80, and paragraph 29.33 of Ontario Regulation 548/90.  The Discipline 
 Committee accepted his plea, and found Dr. Alberti guilty of professional misconduct.  The 
 Committee imposed the following penalty:

-	Dr. Alberti(s certificate of registration is suspended 
 for a period of 6 months commencing on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, however 5 months of 
 the suspension shall be suspended provided that Dr. Alberti complies with the following 
 conditions:

(I)	Dr. Alberti shall provide evidence of having paid the sum of $130,000 in the 
 manner hereinafter set out:

(a)	$100,000 shall be paid in two installments, $35,000 before 
 December 31, 1996, and $65,000 before December 31, 1997, respectively, to Mount Sinai Hospital 
 Foundation for academic enrichment and research in the Department of Otolaryngology at the 
 hospital;

(b)	$30,000 shall be paid directly to the Department of Otolaryngology, Mount Sinai 
 Hospital, by December 31, 1996.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 07, 1996