Alberts, Melissa (CPSO#: 86011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Farm:Seldom So
Pk Kiepersol
1241
Kiepersol 1241
South Africa
Phone: +27828883190
Fax: +27137378437
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hendrik and Dr. Melissa Alberts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Alberts ( CPSO# 85892 )
Dr. M. Alberts ( CPSO# 86011 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ALBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBERTS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008