Albietz, John Stuart (CPSO#: 85847)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2007 to 23 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007