Albin-Cook, Krystyna Anna (CPSO#: 59263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
452 Rathburn Road
Etobicoke ON  M9C 3S8
Phone: (416) 621-2323
Fax: (416) 621-2321
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3 MARINE PARADE DRIVE
Toronto ON  M8V 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 503-3332 Ext. 2204
Fax: (416) 503-3305
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3 MARINE PARADE DRIVE
Toronto ON  M8V 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 503-3332 Ext. 2204
Fax: (416) 503-3305
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Albin-Cook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Albin-Cook ( CPSO# 59263 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
452 Rathburn Road
Etobicoke ON  M9C 3S8
Phone Number: (416) 621-2323

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA ANNA ALBIN-COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBIN-COOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991