Albishri, Jamal A S (CPSO#: 77442)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 14 May 2002 to 13 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 May 2003 to 13 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2004