Albugami, Muneerah Mohammed Ageel (CPSO#: 79968)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Jul 2003 to 21 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006