Albuquerque, Joy Maria (CPSO#: 64685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Medical Association
Physician Health Program
150 Bloor Street West, Suite 900
Toronto ON  M5S 3C1
Phone: (416) 340-2954
Fax: (416) 340-2860
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
17th floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond St.
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 5418
Fax: (416) 864-5480
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOY MARIA ALBUQUERQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBUQUERQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1991