Alcock, Carl Joseph (CPSO#: 54965)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 toll free 1.800.775.0093 - fax: 1.888.316.4125 info@recordsregistry.ca
Instructions: Contact Records Management
Date Received: 29 Nov 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Aug 2010
Summary:

 On August, 6, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Alcock has committed an act of 
 professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)34 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the 
 Medicine Act, 1991, in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming for a physician  he was found guilty 
 of the criminal offences of assault and Theft Under $5,000, in 2000 and 2003, 
 respectively.
Regarding the assault conviction, Dr. Alcock attempted to physically remove his then 
 common law wife from the couch against her will after a dispute arose over her smoking a cigarette 
 inside the house.  Dr. Alcock received a suspended sentence and six months probation.  The theft 
 conviction related to stealing groceries from a store.  Dr. Alcock received a suspended sentence 
 and one year probation and was ordered to participate in such counselling as probation might 
 advise.  
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. Alcock appear before it to 
 be reprimanded.
2.	Dr. Alcock pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty 
 (30) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 5-6, 2010