Alda, Martin (CPSO#: 60412)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 May 2005


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Faculty Paediatrics, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2005