Aldandashi, Samer (CPSO#: 88312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Alexandra Hospital
10240 Kingsway Avenue
Edmonton AB  T5H 3V9
Phone: (780) 735-4181

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMER ALDANDASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDANDASHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016