Alderdice, Catherine Ann (CPSO#: 44819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone: (519) 767-3400
Fax: (519) 767-3431
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Alderdice, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Alderdice ( CPSO# 44819 )

Business Address:
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone Number: (519) 824-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 09 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANN ALDERDICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDERDICE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2003