Aldhaheri, Afra Abdulla Humaid Abdulla (CPSO#: 108409)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 23 Mar 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017