Aldis, Ann Elizabeth (CPSO#: 30321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mcgill University Health Centre
Department of Radiology Glen Site
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 May 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANN ELIZABETH ALDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1987