Aldosari, Mubarak Mohammed M (CPSO#: 107349)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Aug 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017