Aldridge, David John (CPSO#: 30757)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006