Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Aldumairy, Khalid Abdulrahman Tarif (CPSO#: 69718)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 07 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 1999