Aleem, Nadia (CPSO#: 85182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
455 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 77350
Fax: (416) 971-7172
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Aleem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Aleem ( CPSO# 85182 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
455 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA ALEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010