Alemayehu, Efrem (CPSO#: 56493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Tigrigna

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1670 Dufferin Street
Suite 205
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone: (416) 539-9002
Fax: (416) 539-0309
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Efrem Alemayehu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Alemayehu ( CPSO# 56493 )

Business Address:
205 - 1670 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone Number: (416) 539-9002

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EFREM ALEMAYEHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEMAYEHU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1986
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990