Alenazi, Kamel Awadh Sanad (CPSO#: 107949)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 04 Sep 2015 to 04 Nov 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 05 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 03 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2017