Alenazy, Ali Bshait H (CPSO#: 107209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 26 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Department of Cardiac Imaging
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-5115
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI BSHAIT H ALENAZY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALENAZY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ALENAZY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALENAZY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALENAZY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALENAZY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALENAZY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018