Alexander, Ashlin James (CPSO#: 84548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Head & Neck Clinic
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 101
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 787-5511
Fax: (416) 787-1592
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ashlin Alexander Facial Cosmetic
Surgery
251 Davenport Road
Toronto ON  M5R 1J9
Canada
Phone: (416) 479-9528
Fax: (416) 920-4244
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashlin Alexander Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alexander ( CPSO# 84548 )

Business Address:
300 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 787-5511

Business Address:
251 Davenport Road
Toronto ON  M5R 1J9

Business Address:
Suite 6
1415 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1C 2L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLIN JAMES ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013