Alexander, David John (CPSO#: 55675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Colborne Street West
Suite 306
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Phone: (705) 327-6652
Fax: (705) 327-6693
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1991