Alexander, John Peter (CPSO#: 24347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
366 Lexington Road
Waterloo ON  N2K 2K2
Phone: (519) 725-3943
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

349 Park St.,
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Canada
Phone: 519-744-7361
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PETER ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 May 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1975