Alexander, Kimberly Anne (CPSO#: 76085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: Marrow, Kimberly Anne (used until: 13 Aug 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Suite 503
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 595-4960
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K Alexander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alexander ( CPSO# 76085 )

Business Address:
Suite 503
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 595-4960

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANNE ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2006