Alexander, Michelle Lee (CPSO#: 66910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham ON  L6B 1B6
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Alexander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alexander ( CPSO# 66910 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham ON  L6B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LEE ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1995