Alexander, Nancy Jeannette (CPSO#: 14784)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991