Alexander, Sheila Ann (CPSO#: 53855)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Apr 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2016