Alexander, Walter James (CPSO#: 21010)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Dec 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009