Alexopoulos, Karen Natalie (CPSO#: 66383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: (519) 837-2283
Fax: (519) 767-2262
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. N. Alexopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alexopoulos ( CPSO# 66383 )

Business Address:
208 - 55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 837-2283

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN NATALIE ALEXOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1995