Aleyaseen, Maryam (CPSO#: 72288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 686-8679
Fax: (905) 686-4324
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Aleyaseen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aleyaseen ( CPSO# 72288 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 686-8679

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM ALEYASEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEYASEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004