Alfakeh, Sulhi Ali S (CPSO#: 95002)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Centre for Additction and Mental Health 1001 Queen St W, Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 23 Jul 2011
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2011 to 23 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017