Alfardan, Jaffar Mohamed Ali Ali Ebrahim (CPSO#: 77023)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003